BOLDEN v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL

Plaintiff: WANDA F BOLDEN
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
1 Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : All Discovery must be completed by 7/17/2020. The pretrial conference will be scheduled by the Court after ruling on any pending dispositive motions and the trial date will be determined at the pretrial conference. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 3/11/2019. (alb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order) (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
March 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order) (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/24/2019. (alb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Francis M. McDonald, Jr., Sarah A. Long, and Jessica M. Kennedy substituted in as attorney of record. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/22/2019. (alb)
January 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record (See proposed ISO) (alb)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 21, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT TO: T.Falcon, J. Falcon, J. Sprague. (Attachments: #1 D. Haycraft, #2 K. Hodges, #3 C. McEldowney) (alb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE TO: T. Falcon, J. Falcon and J. Sprague. (Attachments: #1 D. Haycraft, #2 K. Hodges, #3 C. McEldowney) (alb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-08614.
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northen District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/14/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance with Case Management Order by Wanda F Bolden re #4 Order. (Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing fee paid from Wanda F Bolden re #1 Complaint (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7114980) (Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Wanda F Bolden.Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Wanda F Bolden(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A BP Election Not to Mediate) (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLDEN v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA F BOLDEN
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?