HUDSON v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL

Plaintiff: TRAVIS HUDSON
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00062
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER the Court will conduct a Rule 16 management conference at 9:00 A.M. (Central Time) on March 28, 2019, at the United States District Court, Winston E. Arnow Federal Building, 100 North Palafox Street, Courtroom II, Pensacola, Florida. Counsel may appear in person or by telephone and are directed to notify the Court of their intended manner of appearance no later than 24 hours prior to the scheduled proceeding. The clerk will provide counsel with any necessary instructions for telephone appearance. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/13/2019. (alb)
March 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order) (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv62-MCR/HTC.
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2019. Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2019. (alb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2019. (alb) Modified on 1/22/2019 Francis M. McDonald, Jr., Sarah A. Long, and Jessica M. Kennedy substituted in as attorney of record. (alb).
January 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record (alb) Modified on 1/22/2019 (See proposed ISO) (alb).
January 21, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENTS TO : D. Haycraft. (Attachments: #1 K. Hodges, #2 C. McEldowney, #3 Falcon Law Firm) (alb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTIVE TO: D. Haycraft. (Attachments: #1 Falcon Law Firm, #2 K. Hodges, #3 C. McEldowney) (alb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-08617.
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/14/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with Case Management Order by Travis Hudson re #4 Order. (Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by All Defendants (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing fee paid from Travis Hudson re #1 Complaint (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7115010) (Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Travis Hudson.Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Travis Hudson(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A BP Election Not to Mediate) (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUDSON v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS HUDSON
Represented By: Allen W Lindsay, Jr
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?