PALMGREN v. DONOVAN et al
Plaintiff: CLAYTON PALMGREN
Defendant: WENDELL HALL, WILLIAM BLAKE WEEKLEY, OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY OF THE FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT OF FLORIDA, BRAD BANEY, HAROLD E TORRANCE, JR., SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, TIMOTHY J DONOVAN, BOB JOHNSON, IT'S A HOME, INC., WILLIAM EDDINS, WYETTE W DONOVAN, TORRANCE SERVICES, INC., ANDREW T RICHARDS, AMBER A ROWLAND, DONOVAN REALTY, INC., GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR., DANNY PARKS, MARTIN J DONOVAN, GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR, WILLIE JAMES ODOM, HAROLD E TORRANCE, JR, TORRANCE SERVICES INC, DONOVAN REALTY INC and IT'S A HOME INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by MARTIN J DONOVAN, TIMOTHY J DONOVAN, WYETTE W DONOVAN, DONOVAN REALTY INC, IT'S A HOME INC (KELLY, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Consent to Notice of Removal by HAROLD E TORRANCE, JR, TORRANCE SERVICES INC (FRETLAND, MILLARD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSE PAGAN on behalf of MARTIN J DONOVAN (PAGAN, JOSE)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Consent to Removal by WILLIAM EDDINS, OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY OF THE FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT OF FLORIDA, AMBER A ROWLAND (HAMMONS, JOSEPH)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing State Court Papers by WENDELL HALL, GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR, BOB JOHNSON, DANNY PARKS, ANDREW T RICHARDS, SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, WILLIAM BLAKE WEEKLEY re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71) (WARNER, WILLIAM)
January 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Filing State Court Records. (alb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
January 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (alb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRAD BANEY, DANNY PARKS, GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR., WILLIAM BLAKE WEEKLEY, WENDELL HALL, BOB JOHNSON, SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANDREW T RICHARDS from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FL, case number 2018 CA 605. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4381546.), filed by BRAD BANEY, DANNY PARKS, GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR., WILLIAM BLAKE WEEKLEY, WENDELL HALL, BOB JOHNSON, SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANDREW T RICHARDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (WARNER, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALMGREN v. DONOVAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDELL HALL
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BLAKE WEEKLEY
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY OF THE FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT OF FLORIDA
Represented By: JOSEPH L HAMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD BANEY
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD E TORRANCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY J DONOVAN
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: CLAY HENDERSON WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB JOHNSON
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT'S A HOME, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM EDDINS
Represented By: JOSEPH L HAMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETTE W DONOVAN
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: CLAY HENDERSON WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRANCE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW T RICHARDS
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER A ROWLAND
Represented By: JOSEPH L HAMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONOVAN REALTY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANNY PARKS
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J DONOVAN
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: CLAY HENDERSON WHITTAKER
Represented By: JOSE PAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE B HAWKINS, JR
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIE JAMES ODOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD E TORRANCE, JR
Represented By: MILLARD LANE FRETLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRANCE SERVICES INC
Represented By: MILLARD LANE FRETLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONOVAN REALTY INC
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: CLAY HENDERSON WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT'S A HOME INC
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: CLAY HENDERSON WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYTON PALMGREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?