LIBRACE v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT et al

Plaintiff: DAVID LIBRACE
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT and FLORIDA STATE ATTORNEY OFFICE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00393
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
1 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #7 Amended Complaint, #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (djb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID LIBRACE. (MB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT, FLORIDA STATE ATTORNEY OFFICE, filed by DAVID LIBRACE. (No service copies). (MB)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a financial affidavit approved for use by non-prisoners in the Northern District of Florida. Clerk must also send Plaintiff a Section 1983 complaint form approved for use by non-prisoners. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/4/2019. (Filing Fee or IFP Motion due by 4/4/2019.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). (MB)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion For Permission For Electronic Case Filing. The court does not normally allow its pro se litigants to access the courts electronic filing system. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/4/2019. (MB)
February 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION For Permission For Electronic Case Filing. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION For Permission For Electronic Case Filing by DAVID LIBRACE. (MB)
February 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies). #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, DAVID LIBRACE. (MB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID LIBRACE. (MB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT, FLORIDA STATE ATTORNEY OFFICE, filed by DAVID LIBRACE. (No service copies). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBRACE v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LIBRACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF LAW ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA STATE ATTORNEY OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?