BURNS v. INCH

Petitioner: PAUL BURNS
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Case Number: 3:2019cv00394
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Acknowledgment filed by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF FL, ASHLEY MOODY. (MB)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Acknowledgment filed by MARK S INCH. (MB)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The clerk is directed to furnish a copy of the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with a copy of this order to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall have 90 DAYS from the date of docketing of this order to file a response as directed by this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/27/2019. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/28/2019.) (copies sent certified mail) (djb)
February 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: 4 Habeas Filing Fee Received. (MB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN3-12678. Fee status updated to paid. (MB)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. clerk of court is directed to send Petitioner a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Petitioner shall (1) pay the filing fee of $5.00, or (2) submit a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/13/2019. (Filing Fee or IFP Motion due by 3/13/2019.) (Form mailed w/ORDER). (MB)
February 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (2 Service copies/fees not paid/no IFP). (MB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, PAUL BURNS. (MB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by PAUL BURNS. (2 Service copies/fees not paid/no IFP). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNS v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?