MURPHY v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL
Plaintiff: JAMES ALAN MURPHY
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00440
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
3 Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON, MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv440-MCR/GRJ.
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
April 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv440-RV/HTC.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2019. Discovery due by 7/29/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 3/1/2019. (alb)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 3/1/2019. (alb)
March 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record (See proposed R&O and ISO.) (alb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to : C. Downs, V. Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Atty Haycraft, #2 Atty Hodges, #3 Atty McEldowney) (alb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE filed by: Atty V. Diaz, C. Downs. (Attachments: #1 Atty Haycraft, #2 Atty Hodges, #3 Atty McEldowney) (alb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-06808.
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/21/2018.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Statement by All Defendants Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7010341) filed by James Alan Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party James Alan Murphy(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) Modified on 7/19/2018 (gec). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ALAN MURPHY
Represented By: NATHAN LEE NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Represented By: COURTNEY MICHELLE KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Represented By: COURTNEY MICHELLE KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?