WILSON v. SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: CALVIN WILSON
Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00455
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #14 Rule 26 Disclosures filed by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (MB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26 Disclosures by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline is extended to 12/10/2019. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions 1/10/2020. Mediation must be completed on or before 1/10/2020. Mediation Report due by 1/24/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/29/2019. (djb)
March 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (djb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Removal, ECF No. #5 , is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/11/2019. (MB)
March 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 RESPONSE by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 Response/Reply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. #5 RESPONSE by CALVIN WILSON re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's response in Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Removal for Lack of Jurisdiction by CALVIN WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C) per #8 Order. (MB)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv455-MCR/HTC.
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. Indeed, the Court construes Plaintiff's Response, ECF No. #5 , as a Motion to Remand. Thus, Defendant will be given the opportunity to respond. Defendant's response is due 14 DAYS from the date of this Order, see N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 7.1(E). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/4/2019. (Response to motion due by 3/18/2019). (MB)
March 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Reply, to #5 Response re: #1 Notice of Removal (djb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 Response/Reply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
March 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #5 Response in Support of Notice of Removal (see deadline set for 3/14/2019 to file a reply) (djb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File re #5 Response/Reply, a Reply in Support of Notice of Removal by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
February 28, 2019 Set Deadlines re #5 Response - Motion to Remand. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/14/2019). (MB)
February 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 RESPONSE by CALVIN WILSON re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's response in Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Removal for Lack of Jurisdiction by CALVIN WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (FENIMORE, MICHAEL) (MB)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by CALVIN WILSON re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's response in Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Removal for Lack of Jurisdiction by CALVIN WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (FENIMORE, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/14/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2019. Discovery due by 8/26/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/28/2019. (MB)
February 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY from Escambia County, case number 2019 CA 178. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4416663.), filed by SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (PALMER, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN WILSON
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD FENIMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?