HURRY v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Plaintiff: DONNELL HURRY
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00483
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
1 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10781. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/12/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Statement. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Georgia L. Lucier, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. 2. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Donnell Hurry Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) Modified filers on 3/12/2019 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7226899) filed by Donnell Hurry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Donnell Hurry(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HURRY v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNELL HURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?