WASH v. BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC et al

Plaintiff: RICKY LEE WASH
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00484
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10246. Original file with document numbers 1 - 13 received.
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/12/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #5 Motion to Compel: Oral argument was conducted in the matters listed below on February 27, 2019, regarding defendants' 148 motions to compel disclosures from plaintiffs. At the hearing, counsel agreed that disclosure requirements have been satisfied in the following cases. Accordingly, defendants' motions to compel in the following cases are dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2019 re #5 Defendants' 148 Motions to Compel Disclosures. SUBMITTED. A separate order consistent with the oral rulings at the hearing will be issued. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ricky Lee Wash re #5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing . (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ricky Lee Wash re #5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing . (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for defendant's #5 motions to compel currently set for submission on February 20, 2019, is hereby CONTINUED to February 27, 2019, and oral argument on all of these motions will be conducted on FEBRUARY 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for all affected plaintiffs and defendant must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. regarding #5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7205120) filed by Ricky Lee Wash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Ricky Lee Wash(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASH v. BP EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY LEE WASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?