BRADLEY v. WILLIAMS et al

Plaintiff: RUSSELL W BRADLEY
Defendant: DEPUTY, PROSECUTOR, PUBLIC DEFENDER and WILLIAMS
Case Number: 3:2019cv00567
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by non-prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 6/24/2019. (form to Pla) (sdw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by RUSSELL W BRADLEY to: 2800 E. Cervantes, Pensacola FL 32502. (sdw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Re: 3 Notice to Pro Se. (return to sender, addressee not at this address) (sdw)
April 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant RUSSELL W BRADLEY. (sdw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RUSSELL W BRADLEY. (sdw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUTY, PROSECUTOR, PUBLIC DEFENDER, and WILLIAMS filed by RUSSELL W BRADLEY. (no service copies) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY v. WILLIAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL W BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSECUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC DEFENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?