IRVIN v 3M COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: LINCOLN IRVIN
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00668
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT) (djb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01895. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Florida Northern. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Geiger, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; 3M Company served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Geiger, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Creation of a Multidistrict Litigation Proceeding. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/21/2019. (ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, by 3M Company and Lincoln Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order re Joint Motion to Stay)Attorney Jay M. Mattappally added to party 3M Company(pty:dft).(Mattappally, Jay) Modified text on 3/21/2019 to include all filers (ajn). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7456671) filed by Lincoln Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Andrew J. Geiger added to party Lincoln Irvin(pty:pla).(Geiger, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IRVIN v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: JAY M. MATTAPPALLY
Represented By: STEPHEN G.A. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINCOLN IRVIN
Represented By: ALLAN BERGER
Represented By: ANDREW J. GEIGER
Represented By: ANDREW J GEIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?