WRIGHT v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: ANTONIO J WRIGHT
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01481
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement. (djb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01908. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-10 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding MDL No. 2885 to be transferred to the NDFL. (rlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (rlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Antonio J. Wright re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Antonio J. Wright (Miller, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Antonio J. Wright. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8624849) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 5/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO J WRIGHT
Represented By: Rhon E. Jones
Represented By: Joseph Parker Miller
Represented By: Andrew F. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?