NORMAN v 3M COMPANY

Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Petitioner: KENDALL NORMAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv01491
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-00820. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-10) transferring case to: Northern District of Florida. MDL case number: MDL-2885 (MAA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/21/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to 3M Company. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-820-Orl-41GJK. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15411576) filed by Kendall Norman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Martinez, Roberto) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORMAN v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENDALL NORMAN
Represented By: FRANCISCO RAUL MADERAL
Represented By: ROBERTO MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?