SALAAM v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: TARIQ SALAAM
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01498
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION, and #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00346. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-11, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Florida to be included in MDL No. 2885. Signed on 5/16/19. Case electronically transferred. (Moore, Terri) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 2885 with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Moore, Terri) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M Company. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to Plaintiff's attorneys. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 5/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ryan Joseph Loehr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number BMOWDC-6297014. Service due by 8/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loehr, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAAM v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARIQ SALAAM
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Loehr
Represented By: J. Scott Bertram
Represented By: Timothy Ray West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?