LIEN v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: KIM K LIEN
Defendant: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01550
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Accept Response to #6 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's #9 Motion is accepted as timely filed. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2019. (alb)
July 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Defendant, Owners Insurance Company's MOTION to Accept Response to, #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion. (alb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant, Owners Insurance Company's MOTION to Accept Response to #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) Modified on 7/8/2019 to clarify title of document (alb).
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
July 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. (No response filed.) (alb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery deadline is extended to 2/10/2020., The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 3/10/2020. Mediation to be completed by 3/9/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report by 3/23/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (alb)
July 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
June 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #6 Motion for Remand (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/3/2019). (alb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by KIM K LIEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 DEMAND, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 COUNTEROFFER, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 COUNTERDEMAND, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 FULL AND FINAL OFFER, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5 MENDOZA ORDER) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
June 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Scheduling Order. (No Corporate Disclosures Statement filed.) (alb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2019. (alb)
May 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PALMER, ELIZABETH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY from Escambia County Circuit Civil, case number 2019 CA 000671. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4503090.), filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PALMER, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIEN v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM K LIEN
Represented By: JOSEPH A ZARZAUR, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?