SMITH v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: FLOYD SMITH
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv02004
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/22/2019. (MB)
August 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed iso). (MB)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CONNECTICUT GENERAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed), to August 21, 2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/8/2019. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/21/2019).) (MB)
August 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Unopposed (please see proposed R&O). (MB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Unopposed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FLOYD SMITH. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS) (MACLAREN, ROBERT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (MB)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4545608.), filed by FLOYD SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS TO CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER) (MACLAREN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT IAN MACLAREN, III
Represented By: DANIEL MARK SOLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?