KILPATRICK v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: CEDRIC D. KILPATRICK
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv02105
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/30/2019. Added attorney JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY,SARAH A LONG for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (djb)
July 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Initial Disclosures. Plaintiff's deadline has already been extended beyond the requested extension requested in this motion, through and including 7/1/2019 by separate #7 order. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/12/2019. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 23, 2019 DEFICIENT FILING DEADLINE TERMINATED: re Notice of Deficient Filing. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cedric D. Kilpatrick. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Falcon, Timothy) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 16, 2019 ***Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Cedric D. Kilpatrick. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT DOCUMENT: re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Reason(s) of deficiency: This is considered an opposed motion. Memorandum and Notice of Submission not provided. For corrective information, see section(s) D12 on http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/cmecf/Deficiency/deficiency.htm Attention: Document must be refiled in its entirety within seven(7) calendar days; otherwise, it may be stricken by the court without further notice. Deficiency remedy due by 5/23/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cedric D. Kilpatrick. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falcon, Timothy) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7427440) filed by Cedric D. Kilpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Cedric D. Kilpatrick(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KILPATRICK v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC D. KILPATRICK
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FALCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?