OWENS v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: AUTREY OWENS
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv02120
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record, by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) Modified on 7/23/2019 (djb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00607. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. filed by Autrey Owens.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended BELO Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Autrey Owens. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Amended Complaint)(Falcon, Jarrett) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. filed by Autrey Owens.(Falcon, Jarrett) Modified on 2/26/2019 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7385748) filed by Autrey Owens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Autrey Owens(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTREY OWENS
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FALCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?