POWERS et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WILSON OSPINA, DAVID HAUGHTON, JAOOD WALLACE, JOSHUA BAUMAN, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, JONATHAN BARBOSA, DANIEL KNIFFIN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DEVIN DETHOMASO, ADDIEL PEREZ, CARLOS SANTOS, MATTHEW MANN, ADDISON DALE, MARK POWERS, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, HOUSTON BURKE, JAMES MICHAELIN, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, JAMES ROBERTS, JUSTIN NILES, OSCAR MENDOZA, JASON WILLIAMS, JORDAN BERMAN, BRIAN KELLEY, AARON FULLERTON, DANIEL WADE, TIMOTHY HARRELL, LINDON MCCURDY, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JESUS RIVERA, SOREN FRIES, JORDON BELLAMY, TYLER DALTON, JUSTIN BOWE, SHAWN GOODMAN, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, RANDALL LUCAS, DUPREE WILLIAMS, THOMAS DYE, BRET SHAFER, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, KAMEEKA BOYD, PAUL JANEWAY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, JASON WISTI, JONATHAN JESSIE, JEREMY BLASBERG, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JERMAINE OTEY, DAVID HAGLUND, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, TIMOTHY MILLS, EDWARD RUSH, THOMAS GARDNER, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JON KLEIN, FRED ROACH, JOSEPH PEEPLES, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, TIMOTHY GAJKA, JAMES THATCHER, MARK RUSH, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, SHAUN MEARS, RUBEN AYALA, JUSTIN MUNIZ, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, ROBERT HULSEY, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, DEREK RALPH, ANDREW PATERSON, JASON HOUSTON, HOMER MUNROE, DAVID HICKOX, TRAVIS BONDY, HEATH O'BERRY, MITCHELL HAMILTON, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, BRYAN ANDERSON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, PRESTON JACKSON, DAVOD SHARON, MAX QUEZADA, JAMES MOSLEY, JAMES NELSON, EVAN WILSON, GREGORY WENTZ, GABRIEL GARCIA and SEAN MCELHINEY
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02957
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #20 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand , #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by BRYAN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, RUBEN AYALA, JONATHAN BARBOSA, JOSHUA BAUMAN, JORDON BELLAMY, JORDAN BERMAN, JEREMY BLASBERG, TRAVIS BONDY, JUSTIN BOWE, KAMEEKA BOYD, HOUSTON BURKE, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, ADDISON DALE, TYLER DALTON, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, DEVIN DETHOMASO, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, THOMAS DYE, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, SOREN FRIES, AARON FULLERTON, TIMOTHY GAJKA, GABRIEL GARCIA, THOMAS GARDNER, SHAWN GOODMAN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DAVID HAGLUND, MITCHELL HAMILTON, TIMOTHY HARRELL, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, DAVID HAUGHTON, DAVID HICKOX, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JASON HOUSTON, ROBERT HULSEY, PRESTON JACKSON, PAUL JANEWAY, JONATHAN JESSIE, BRIAN KELLEY, JON KLEIN, DANIEL KNIFFIN, RANDALL LUCAS, MATTHEW MANN, LINDON MCCURDY, SEAN MCELHINEY, SHAUN MEARS, OSCAR MENDOZA, JAMES MICHAELIN, TIMOTHY MILLS, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JAMES MOSLEY, JUSTIN MUNIZ, HOMER MUNROE, JAMES NELSON, JUSTIN NILES, HEATH O'BERRY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, WILSON OSPINA, JERMAINE OTEY, ANDREW PATERSON, JOSEPH PEEPLES, ADDIEL PEREZ, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, MARK POWERS, MAX QUEZADA, DEREK RALPH, JESUS RIVERA, FRED ROACH, JAMES ROBERTS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD RUSH, MARK RUSH, CARLOS SANTOS, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, BRET SHAFER, DAVOD SHARON, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, JAMES THATCHER, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, DANIEL WADE, JAOOD WALLACE, GREGORY WENTZ, DUPREE WILLIAMS, JASON WILLIAMS, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, EVAN WILSON, JASON WISTI. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb)
September 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand and, In the Alternative, Objections to Exhibits Appended to Defendants' #15 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for Leave to File re #13 MOTION to Remand , #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #15 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply Memorandum in Support by BRYAN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, RUBEN AYALA, JONATHAN BARBOSA, JOSHUA BAUMAN, JORDON BELLAMY, JORDAN BERMAN, JEREMY BLASBERG, TRAVIS BONDY, JUSTIN BOWE, KAMEEKA BOYD, HOUSTON BURKE, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, ADDISON DALE, TYLER DALTON, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, DEVIN DETHOMASO, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, THOMAS DYE, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, SOREN FRIES, AARON FULLERTON, TIMOTHY GAJKA, GABRIEL GARCIA, THOMAS GARDNER, SHAWN GOODMAN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DAVID HAGLUND, MITCHELL HAMILTON, TIMOTHY HARRELL, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, DAVID HAUGHTON, DAVID HICKOX, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JASON HOUSTON, ROBERT HULSEY, PRESTON JACKSON, PAUL JANEWAY, JONATHAN JESSIE, BRIAN KELLEY, JON KLEIN, DANIEL KNIFFIN, RANDALL LUCAS, MATTHEW MANN, LINDON MCCURDY, SEAN MCELHINEY, SHAUN MEARS, OSCAR MENDOZA, JAMES MICHAELIN, TIMOTHY MILLS, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JAMES MOSLEY, JUSTIN MUNIZ, HOMER MUNROE, JAMES NELSON, JUSTIN NILES, HEATH O'BERRY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, WILSON OSPINA, JERMAINE OTEY, ANDREW PATERSON, JOSEPH PEEPLES, ADDIEL PEREZ, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, MARK POWERS, MAX QUEZADA, DEREK RALPH, JESUS RIVERA, FRED ROACH, JAMES ROBERTS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD RUSH, MARK RUSH, CARLOS SANTOS, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, BRET SHAFER, DAVOD SHARON, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, JAMES THATCHER, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, DANIEL WADE, JAOOD WALLACE, GREGORY WENTZ, DUPREE WILLIAMS, JASON WILLIAMS, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, EVAN WILSON, JASON WISTI. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File re #13 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply Memorandum in Support by BRYAN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, RUBEN AYALA, JONATHAN BARBOSA, JOSHUA BAUMAN, JORDON BELLAMY, JORDAN BERMAN, JEREMY BLASBERG, TRAVIS BONDY, JUSTIN BOWE, KAMEEKA BOYD, HOUSTON BURKE, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, ADDISON DALE, TYLER DALTON, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, DEVIN DETHOMASO, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, THOMAS DYE, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, SOREN FRIES, AARON FULLERTON, TIMOTHY GAJKA, GABRIEL GARCIA, THOMAS GARDNER, SHAWN GOODMAN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DAVID HAGLUND, MITCHELL HAMILTON, TIMOTHY HARRELL, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, DAVID HAUGHTON, DAVID HICKOX, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JASON HOUSTON, ROBERT HULSEY, PRESTON JACKSON, PAUL JANEWAY, JONATHAN JESSIE, BRIAN KELLEY, JON KLEIN, DANIEL KNIFFIN, RANDALL LUCAS, MATTHEW MANN, LINDON MCCURDY, SEAN MCELHINEY, SHAUN MEARS, OSCAR MENDOZA, JAMES MICHAELIN, TIMOTHY MILLS, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JAMES MOSLEY, JUSTIN MUNIZ, HOMER MUNROE, JAMES NELSON, JUSTIN NILES, HEATH O'BERRY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, WILSON OSPINA, JERMAINE OTEY, ANDREW PATERSON, JOSEPH PEEPLES, ADDIEL PEREZ, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, MARK POWERS, MAX QUEZADA, DEREK RALPH, JESUS RIVERA, FRED ROACH, JAMES ROBERTS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD RUSH, MARK RUSH, CARLOS SANTOS, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, BRET SHAFER, DAVOD SHARON, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, JAMES THATCHER, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, DANIEL WADE, JAOOD WALLACE, GREGORY WENTZ, DUPREE WILLIAMS, JASON WILLIAMS, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, EVAN WILSON, JASON WISTI. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/10/2019. (sdw)
September 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Remand , #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #15 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-11 (Filed Under Seal)) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
August 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/9/2019). (djb)
August 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by BRYAN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, RUBEN AYALA, JONATHAN BARBOSA, JOSHUA BAUMAN, JORDON BELLAMY, JORDAN BERMAN, JEREMY BLASBERG, TRAVIS BONDY, JUSTIN BOWE, KAMEEKA BOYD, HOUSTON BURKE, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, ADDISON DALE, TYLER DALTON, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, DEVIN DETHOMASO, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, THOMAS DYE, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, SOREN FRIES, AARON FULLERTON, TIMOTHY GAJKA, GABRIEL GARCIA, THOMAS GARDNER, SHAWN GOODMAN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DAVID HAGLUND, MITCHELL HAMILTON, TIMOTHY HARRELL, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, DAVID HAUGHTON, DAVID HICKOX, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JASON HOUSTON, ROBERT HULSEY, PRESTON JACKSON, PAUL JANEWAY, JONATHAN JESSIE, BRIAN KELLEY, JON KLEIN, DANIEL KNIFFIN, RANDALL LUCAS, MATTHEW MANN, LINDON MCCURDY, SEAN MCELHINEY, SHAUN MEARS, OSCAR MENDOZA, JAMES MICHAELIN, TIMOTHY MILLS, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JAMES MOSLEY, JUSTIN MUNIZ, HOMER MUNROE, JAMES NELSON, JUSTIN NILES, HEATH O'BERRY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, WILSON OSPINA, JERMAINE OTEY, ANDREW PATERSON, JOSEPH PEEPLES, ADDIEL PEREZ, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, MARK POWERS, MAX QUEZADA, DEREK RALPH, JESUS RIVERA, FRED ROACH, JAMES ROBERTS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD RUSH, MARK RUSH, CARLOS SANTOS, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, BRET SHAFER, DAVOD SHARON, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, JAMES THATCHER, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, DANIEL WADE, JAOOD WALLACE, GREGORY WENTZ, DUPREE WILLIAMS, JASON WILLIAMS, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, EVAN WILSON, JASON WISTI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of BRYAN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN ANDREWS, RUBEN AYALA, JONATHAN BARBOSA, JOSHUA BAUMAN, JORDON BELLAMY, JORDAN BERMAN, JEREMY BLASBERG, TRAVIS BONDY, JUSTIN BOWE, KAMEEKA BOYD, HOUSTON BURKE, JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON, JOSHUA CIVILETTI, ADDISON DALE, TYLER DALTON, ANTONIO DEGUGAS, DEVIN DETHOMASO, MICHAEL DILLINGHAM, THOMAS DYE, AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF, SOREN FRIES, AARON FULLERTON, TIMOTHY GAJKA, GABRIEL GARCIA, THOMAS GARDNER, SHAWN GOODMAN, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DAVID HAGLUND, MITCHELL HAMILTON, TIMOTHY HARRELL, RUDOLPHO HATCHER, DAVID HAUGHTON, DAVID HICKOX, JOHN HOLMSTROM, JASON HOUSTON, ROBERT HULSEY, PRESTON JACKSON, PAUL JANEWAY, JONATHAN JESSIE, BRIAN KELLEY, JON KLEIN, DANIEL KNIFFIN, RANDALL LUCAS, MATTHEW MANN, LINDON MCCURDY, SEAN MCELHINEY, SHAUN MEARS, OSCAR MENDOZA, JAMES MICHAELIN, TIMOTHY MILLS, ALFREDO MIRANDA, JAMES MOSLEY, JUSTIN MUNIZ, HOMER MUNROE, JAMES NELSON, JUSTIN NILES, HEATH O'BERRY, RAYNEIL ODLUM, WILSON OSPINA, JERMAINE OTEY, ANDREW PATERSON, JOSEPH PEEPLES, ADDIEL PEREZ, JOSHUA PIMENTEL, MARK POWERS, MAX QUEZADA, DEREK RALPH, JESUS RIVERA, FRED ROACH, JAMES ROBERTS, STEVEN RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD RUSH, MARK RUSH, CARLOS SANTOS, ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS, BRET SHAFER, DAVOD SHARON, ZACHRY SKIDMORE, ROBERT SOUTHLAND, JAMES THATCHER, CHRISTOPHER TURNER, DANIEL WADE, JAOOD WALLACE, GREGORY WENTZ, DUPREE WILLIAMS, JASON WILLIAMS, JOHN WILLIS, JOSHUA WILLIS, EVAN WILSON, JASON WISTI (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01972. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company.(Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. De Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1972 DSD/ECW. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT - Summons and Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-11789 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7022290) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Judicial Assignment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWERS et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILSON OSPINA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HAUGHTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAOOD WALLACE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BAUMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHRY SKIDMORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN BARBOSA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL KNIFFIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH GOTTSMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN DETHOMASO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADDIEL PEREZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS SANTOS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MANN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADDISON DALE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK POWERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER TURNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSTON BURKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAELIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUSTUS FETTERHOFF
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN ANDREWS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ROBERTS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN NILES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR MENDOZA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN BERMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN KELLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON FULLERTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL WADE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY HARRELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDON MCCURDY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFREDO MIRANDA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS RIVERA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOREN FRIES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDON BELLAMY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER DALTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BOWE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN GOODMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL LUCAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUPREE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS DYE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRET SHAFER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WILLIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA WILLIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMEEKA BOYD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL JANEWAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYNEIL ODLUM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WISTI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN JESSIE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY BLASBERG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HOLMSTROM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAINE OTEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HAGLUND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SCHMITT-WOODS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MILLS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD RUSH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS GARDNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANCARLO LOPEZ CASTANON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON KLEIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED ROACH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PEEPLES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDOLPHO HATCHER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GAJKA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES THATCHER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK RUSH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SOUTHLAND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN MEARS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN AYALA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MUNIZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO DEGUGAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HULSEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DILLINGHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK RALPH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PATERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HOUSTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOMER MUNROE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HICKOX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS BONDY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH O'BERRY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL HAMILTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PIMENTEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CIVILETTI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTON JACKSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVOD SHARON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAX QUEZADA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MOSLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES NELSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVAN WILSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY WENTZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL GARCIA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN MCELHINEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?