SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC v. ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE
Case Number: 3:2019cv03084
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (doc. #8 ), it is ORDERED that this cause is dismissed, with prejudice and without taxation of costs. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 9/9/2019. (MB)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP E GLATZER on behalf of ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE (GLATZER, PHILIP)
September 5, 2019 Set Deadlines re #6 NOTICE of Settlement. (Notify Chambers on 10/7/2019). (MB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE. (MB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons to be Issued, by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC as to ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, BREACH OF CONTRACT, AND VIOLATION OF SECTION 627.4137, FLORDIA STATUTES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4588924.), filed by SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC v. ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF DOLPHIN DEVELOPERS LLC
Represented By: GREGORY MARK SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALITY INSURANCE
Represented By: PHILIP E GLATZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?