BATTEN v 3M COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BATTEN
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03119
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Florida for inclusion in MDL No. 2885; case uploaded to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/15/19. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/16/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/16/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601099409 (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/16/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/16/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against 3M Company filed by Joseph Batten.(BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATTEN v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BATTEN
Represented By: JEFFREY G BLACKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?