BURNEY v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: JAMES E. BURNEY, JR.
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03122
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN A RAMEY on behalf of JAMES E. BURNEY, JR (RAMEY, MARTIN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00313. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of April 3, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 8/15/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-313-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/26/2019. (Hockaday, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by James E. Burney, Jr (Ramey, Martin) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Martin A. Ramey on behalf of James E. Burney, Jr. (Ramey, Martin) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to James E. Burney, Jr. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5035724.), filed by James E. Burney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Ramey, Martin) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNEY v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES E. BURNEY, JR.
Represented By: MARTIN A RAMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?