BERNIER et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BROWN, JOHN LONDON, HARRISON BERNIER, LESLIE RYAN, JEFFREY HAWK, DANIEL KOOGLER, GRANT ROSS, ARTHUR WIEGELE, BRUCE WHERRY, GORDON FISHER, ROBIN FLANERY, DENNIS CAMBILLO and JASON TUCKER
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03214
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper, Franklin D. Azar, Sean O. McCrary, John Friedberg as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2160 JRT/DTS. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7062802) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERNIER et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BROWN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LONDON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRISON BERNIER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE RYAN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HAWK
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL KOOGLER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT ROSS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR WIEGELE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE WHERRY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GORDON FISHER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN FLANERY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS CAMBILLO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON TUCKER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?