BEYARD et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN LUSHKO, MIGUEL ALVAREZ, GREGG LESCHMAN, JEFFERY ARNOLDY, JAY OLSON, JUSTIN PECORARO, MICHAEL LUGENBELL, RAJAT ADHIKARI, ERIC PROPER, JEREMY ASHLEY, ADAM BEYARD, THEODORE BEAHM, JAMES ASHLEY, WILLARD WHITTON, KELLAN SHEELY, JUSTIN BARLOW, ANTHONY BARRY, LOUIS BELLUOMINI, JEREMY SIRUC, JOSEPH BEAVERS, JUAN ALBA, NATHANIEL COLWELL, MICHAEL AILSTOCK, GREGORY ADAMS, KARL AUS-DER-AU, TRISTAN BAKER, CHRISTOPHER TYLER, CHAD ALLEN, JONATHAN HUGHES, JEREMY BEAVER, DAVID TODD, JASON ANSPACH, SCOTT ALTGILBERS, JOHN SUTTON, DAVID HOLMDEN, SHELTON STOWERS, DERRICK COMPTON, MATTHEW BERNES, MICHAEL STROUP, DANIEL BELL, TIFFANY FREDERICK, AARON BARNARD, CHRISTOPHER BEASON, JORGE ZARATE, JOHN ALLEN, DANNY ADKINS, HENRY BELL, BRANDON STAUFFER, JONATHAN BANISTER and JONATHAN BANNISTER
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03280
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. DANNY ADKINS, MICHAEL AILSTOCK, JUAN ALBA, CHAD ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, SCOTT ALTGILBERS, MIGUEL ALVAREZ, JASON ANSPACH, JEFFERY ARNOLDY, JAMES ASHLEY, JEREMY ASHLEY, KARL AUS-DER-AU, TRISTAN BAKER, JONATHAN BANISTER, JONATHAN BANNISTER, JUSTIN BARLOW, AARON BARNARD, ANTHONY BARRY, THEODORE BEAHM, CHRISTOPHER BEASON, JEREMY BEAVER, JOSEPH BEAVERS, DANIEL BELL, HENRY BELL, LOUIS BELLUOMINI, MATTHEW BERNES, NATHANIEL COLWELL, DERRICK COMPTON, TIFFANY FREDERICK, DAVID HOLMDEN, JONATHAN HUGHES, GREGG LESCHMAN, MICHAEL LUGENBELL, STEVEN LUSHKO, JAY OLSON, JUSTIN PECORARO, ERIC PROPER, KELLAN SHEELY, JEREMY SIRUC, BRANDON STAUFFER, SHELTON STOWERS, MICHAEL STROUP, JOHN SUTTON, DAVID TODD, CHRISTOPHER TYLER, WILLARD WHITTON, JORGE ZARATE, GREGORY ADAMS and RAJAT ADHIKARI terminated. (djb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier; K. Rachal Lanier; Cristina Delise; Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2226 (WMW/HB). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MN, 2nd Judicial District (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7076903) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEYARD et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN LUSHKO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ALVAREZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG LESCHMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY ARNOLDY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY OLSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN PECORARO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LUGENBELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJAT ADHIKARI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC PROPER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY ASHLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM BEYARD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE BEAHM
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ASHLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLARD WHITTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLAN SHEELY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BARLOW
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY BARRY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS BELLUOMINI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY SIRUC
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BEAVERS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN ALBA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL COLWELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL AILSTOCK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY ADAMS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL AUS-DER-AU
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRISTAN BAKER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER TYLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD ALLEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN HUGHES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY BEAVER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID TODD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON ANSPACH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT ALTGILBERS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SUTTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HOLMDEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELTON STOWERS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK COMPTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BERNES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STROUP
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY FREDERICK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON BARNARD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BEASON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE ZARATE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ALLEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY ADKINS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY BELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON STAUFFER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN BANISTER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN BANNISTER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?