CROUCH v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: LEONARD CROUCH
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03359
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division, located at Phillip Burton Federal Building & United States Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco CA 94102. (sdw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) re MDL 2741 to Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 E-mail Request) (sdw)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LEONARD CROUCH. MONSANTO COMPANY served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (MORGAN, TIMOTHY)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (sdw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Amended Proposed Summons by LEONARD CROUCH re #2 Summons Issued (MORGAN, TIMOTHY)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (sdw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4605267.), filed by LEONARD CROUCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (MORGAN, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROUCH v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD CROUCH
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?