AUERBACH v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SYLVIA AUERBACH
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv03360
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Return of Service for Otsuka American Pharmaceutical by SYLVIA AUERBACH (FENNER, DIANE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons - Bristol-Myers Squibb by SYLVIA AUERBACH (FENNER, DIANE)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Plaintiff's Counsel Certification by SYLVIA AUERBACH (FENNER, DIANE)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD (djb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). The code has been added to the Updated Civil Cover Sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17) Please use updated civil cover sheet for all future filings. On the civil cover sheet see "VIII. Related Cases if any" Docket Number should be the lead case number 3:16md2734 and when entering money demand the system adds 3 zeros. Clerk will correct origin code and money demand. (djb)
August 29, 2019 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA MAERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC., #3 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.) (FENNER, DIANE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4605377.), filed by SYLVIA AUERBACH. (FENNER, DIANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUERBACH v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA AUERBACH
Represented By: DIANE FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?