ROLDAN v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EDUARDO ROLDAN
Defendant: DOES 1-10, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, DOE GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES 1-10, DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10, 3M COMPANY, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC and AEARO LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03375
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MASTER SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by EDUARDO ROLDAN. (RECK, MARK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D RECK on behalf of EDUARDO ROLDAN (RECK, MARK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:19-cv-00443. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated 9/5/2019 transferring this case to the USDC for the District of Northern Florida pursuant to MDL Docket No. 2885. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (cib) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Eduardo Roldan ~ The filing party may refer to LR10.2(b) Identification of Person Filing a Document, which states " The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, facsimile number, and e-mail address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left-hand corner of the first page of each paper presented for filing...". No further action necessary. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00443 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Kusachi, Naomi) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2248627.), filed by Eduardo Roldan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kusachi, Naomi) [Transferred from Hawaii on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROLDAN v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO ROLDAN
Represented By: Mark D. Reck
Represented By: Jan K. Apo
Represented By: Naomi Miyoko Kusachi
Represented By: MARK D RECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?