POTOCZEK v. PATRICK et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY POTOCZEK
Defendant: HOWARD PATRICK and BARBARA J PATRICK
Case Number: 3:2019cv03452
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part #4 and #5 Motion's Requesting a Stay of Proceedings. Defendants will have until December 23, 2019, to file a response to the complaint. BARBARA J PATRICK answer due 12/23/2019; HOWARD PATRICK answer due 12/23/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/1/2019. (alb)
October 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #7 Response in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Stay. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay, #4 MOTION to Stay filed by JEFFREY POTOCZEK. (BRANNING, JEREMY)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 and #5 MOTIONS to Stay. Plaintiff shall have seven days to respond. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/23/2019). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/16/2019. (alb)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION Requesting a Stay of Proceedings, #4 MOTION Requesting a Stay of Proceedings. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Requesting a Stay of Proceedings by BARBARA J PATRICK. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting a Stay of Proceedings by HOWARD PATRICK. (sdw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B HOWARD PATRICK and Barbara Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Barbara Patrick) (alb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BRANNING, JEREMY)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4620054.), filed by JEFFREY POTOCZEK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS) (BRANNING, JEREMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POTOCZEK v. PATRICK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY POTOCZEK
Represented By: JEREMY CHASE BRANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA J PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?