MCDOUGLE v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03496
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT to all attorneys of record. re: #13 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00115. (djb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00115. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-35 FLND re:MDL 2885 (MLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Gerard Stranch, IV re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/25/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Bryan Frederick Aylstock re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/25/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court Clerk and parties, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo, LLC for Aearo Technologies, LLC, by Aearo Technologies, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate, LLC for Aearo, LLC, by Aearo, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC for Aearo Intermediate, LLC, by Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC for Aearo Holdings, LLC, by Aearo Holdings, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for 3M Occupational Safety LLC, by 3M Occupational Safety LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01029. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2934815) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Notice and Certificate of Removal, #2 Exhibit - State Court Class Action Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet) (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDOUGLE v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?