JONATHAN v. ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC
Plaintiff: Baxley Jonathan and JONATHAN BAXLEY
Defendant: ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC and ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04764
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY LLC. (ONACKI, JASON)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2020. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/11/2019. (MB)
December 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Affirmative Defenses by ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY LLC. (ONACKI, JASON)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN BAXLEY. ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (SABA, CHRISTOPHER)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC. (MB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4702846.), filed by Baxley Jonathan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (SABA, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONATHAN v. ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baxley Jonathan
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J SABA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN BAXLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J SABA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRONIC METROLOGY LABORATORY LLC
Represented By: JASON BERNARD ONACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?