MALLETY v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: TAWAUN LADARLY MALLETY
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv04866
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a master docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/13/19. (NEF: Judge Barbier)(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than November 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/2/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(dw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7693023) filed by Tawaun LaDarly Mallety. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Tawaun LaDarly Mallety(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALLETY v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAWAUN LADARLY MALLETY
Represented By: HOWARD L NATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?