LAUFER v. EJRFA LLC
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LAUFER
Defendant: EJRFA LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04868
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 12/03/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-00291-MW-GRJ. (kdm)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE re #1 Complaint. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/3/2019. The Clerk shall take all necessary steps to transfer this matter to the Pensacola Division and close the Gainesville file. (kdm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to EJRFA LLC. (kdm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PATRICIA LAUFER. Amendment to #1 Complaint to correct parties (MOORE, SUZETTE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 first amended correcting the parties AMENDED COMPLAINT against EJRFA, LLC, filed by PATRICIA LAUFER. (MOORE, SUZETTE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MOORE, SUZETTE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against EJRFA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4713453.), filed by PATRICIA LAUFER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MOORE, SUZETTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAUFER v. EJRFA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJRFA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LAUFER
Represented By: SUZETTE MARTENY MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?