GIRARD v. JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN STEVEN GIRARD
Defendant: BOB JOHNSON and WELLPATH MEDICAL
Case Number: 3:2019cv04922
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED to the extent the case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Plaintiff's motion to proceed without official signature on motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Santa Rosa County Jail, Attention: Stephanie Barlow, Programs Department, P.O. 7129, Milton, FL 32572. (Order and letter mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/8/2020. (alb)
January 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 MOTION to Proceed without Officials Signature on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed without Officials Signature on #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, by SHAWN STEVEN GIRARD. (alb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by SHAWN STEVEN GIRARD. (alb)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must either (1) pay the filing fee of $400.00, or (2) file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (IFP motion/Fee due by 1/10/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/11/2019. (form to Pla) (sdw)
December 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant (alb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOB JOHNSON, WELLPATH MEDICAL, filed by SHAWN STEVEN GIRARD. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIRARD v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN STEVEN GIRARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?