MOORE v. ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC
Plaintiff: LORI MOORE
Defendant: ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05093
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LORI MOORE. (STORCH, NOAH)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by LORI MOORE re #11 Scheduling Order, (STORCH, NOAH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC identifying Corporate Parent MHSC Inc for ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC.. (DRLICKA, ERICK)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/24/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/25/2020. Discovery due by 8/10/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/10/2020. (sdw)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 02/10/2020. (alb)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/10/2020. (sdw)
February 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Set Aside Default . (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Set Aside Default by ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JOSEPH TW WHITE on behalf of ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC (WHITE, ADAM)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 ***SET ASIDE per #9 Order*** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC. (sdw) Modified on 2/10/2020 (sdw).
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant by LORI MOORE. (STORCH, NOAH)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MOORE. ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (CELLER, RICHARD)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES INC. (sdw)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4758080.), filed by LORI MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons) (STORCH, NOAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGINEERED COOLING SERVICES, INC
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Represented By: RUPERT BRADLEY ADAMS
Represented By: ADAM JOSEPH TW WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI MOORE
Represented By: NOAH E STORCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?