DEKOM v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Appellant: MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR
Case Number: 3:2020cv02351
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF, by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR. (alb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Final Bankrutpcy Transmittal Sheet by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM (Attachments: #1 Cert Copy of Bk Docket, #2 Cert Copy of Claims Register, #3 (Bk Doc. 63 ) Ntc of Designation of Record Items and Appeal Questions, #4(Claim No. 1) Nationstar Mgt Proof of Claim No. 1-1, #5 (Bk Doc. 63 ) Dbtr Obj to Cliam of Nationstar, #6(Bk Doc. 65 ) Ntc of Hrg, #7 (BK Doc. 76 ) Dbtr's Obj to Claim of Nationstar: Obj VII, #8 (Bk Doc. 158 ) Ntc of Obj to Claim and Opp to Obj and For Hrg, #9 (Bk Doc. 96 )Response to Dbtr Obj to Claim of Nationstar Obj VII, #10(Bk Doc. 208 ) Response to Dbtr's Obj 1-VI to Claim of Nationstar, #11 (BK Doc. 237 ) Ord Overruling, In Part, Dbtr Obj to Claim of NationStar) (lmi)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Appeal, #2 Order) (med)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 3/4/2020. Appellee Brief due by 4/3/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/17/2020. (alb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Overrulling Objections, #3 Certified Docket) (med)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEKOM v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH W ECKHART
Represented By: MELBALYNN FISHER
Represented By: NATHALIE C RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?