CARSON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY A CARSON
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA and NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 3:2020cv03583
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MODIFIED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/6/2020. (mb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY A CARSON. NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
March 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Answer to Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond as to #1 Complaint (to March 31, 2020). (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/31/2020).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/11/2020. (mb)
March 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (mb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY A CARSON. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, (Attachments: #1 NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION). (mb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by KIMBERLY A CARSON (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by KIMBERLY A CARSON (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4865143.), filed by KIMBERLY A CARSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARSON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY A CARSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE ANN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?