OLSON v. SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN L OLSON
Defendant: SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC and MTT EQUIPMENT SERVICE, LLP
Case Number: 3:2020cv04060
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC, filed by JONATHAN L OLSON. (HUEY, MICHAEL)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN L OLSON. SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (HUEY, MICHAEL)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MTT EQUIPMENT SERVICE, LLP, SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. (Attachments: #1 SKANSKA USA FL, #2 SKANSKA USA VA) (alb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HUEY, MICHAEL)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4921251.), filed by JONATHAN L OLSON. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR MTT EQUIPMENT, #2 SUMMONS FOR SKANSKA, #3 SUMMONS FOR SKANSKA) (HUEY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSON v. SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTT EQUIPMENT SERVICE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN L OLSON
Represented By: MICHAEL GILBERT HUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?