HORN v. INCH
Petitioner: LUTHER ARTHUR HORN, III
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Case Number: 3:2020cv05101
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 05/18/2020. (alb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LUTHER ARTHUR HORN, III. (alb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/14/2020 with correct copy) (alb).
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed, Return Receipt as to Atty General of FL. #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order. (alb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE, RETURN RECEIPT, Executed as to Mark Inch. Re #1 Petition #4 Order. (alb)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE PETITION AND A RESPONSE BY THE STATE. The clerk shall furnish a copy of the petition and this order to Respondent and to the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall have ninety (90) days from the date this order is entered on the docket in which to file an answer as directed by this order. Re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/25/2020). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 03/27/2020. (alb) Modified on 3/27/2020 Documents mailed certified mail (alb). Modified on 4/1/2020 to complete title of document (alb).
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN300013732. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
March 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LUTHER ARTHUR HORN, III. (2 service copies received. No IFP or fee received.) (alb)
March 20, 2020 SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON added. (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORN v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LUTHER ARTHUR HORN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?