HARVEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Appellant: NELLA FERNANDA HARVEY
Case Number: 3:2020cv05359
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule. Appellant Brief due by 7/6/2020. Appellee Brief due by 8/5/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/19/2020. (sdw)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. This court's order of May 7, 2020 (ECF No. #7 ) is VACATED. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED. Appellant may proceed in the matter without prepaying the filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 05/29/2020. (sdw)
May 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #9 Objection. (sdw)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION by NELLA FERNANDA HARVEY re #8 Amended Order. (sdw)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED. To proceed with this matter, Appellant must submit payment of $298.00 to the Clerk of Court for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Florida within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of docketing of this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 05/07/2020. (sdw)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***VACATED per #10 Order*** ORDER. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED. To proceed with this matter, Appellant must submit payment of $400.00 to the clerk of this court within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of docketing of this order. (Filing Fee due by 6/8/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 05/07/2020. (sdw) Modified on 5/29/2020 (sdw).
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLETE RECORD OF APPEAL (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket, #2 Bk doc 109- Designations of Items; Statement of Issues, #3 Bk doc 1- Adversary Case with Exhibits, #4 Bk doc 4- Amended Complaint, #5 Bk doc 14- Exhibit N, #6 Bk doc 18- Answer to Complaint with Exhibits, #7 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment, #8 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment Exh A-G, #9 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment Exh H-N, #10 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment Exh O-P, #11 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment Exh Q, #12 Bk doc 55- Mtn for Summary Judgment Exh R, #13 Bk doc 80- Plaintiff's Amended Response with Affidavits, #14 Bk doc 80- Plaintiffs Amended Response Exhibits A-I, #15 Bk doc 97- Ord Gr U.S. Dept of Education Mtn for Summary Judgment) (Akinsanya, Sloane)
April 24, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 04/24/2020. (sdw)
April 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #1 NOTICE Of Appeal and Statement of Election, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw)
April 21, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw)
April 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NELLA FERNANDA HARVEY. (sdw)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL SHEET. (sdw)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet (Attachments: #1 Certified Public Docket) (Akinsanya, Sloane)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE Of Appeal and Statement of Election. (Attachments: #1 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL SHEET, #2 ORDER) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: STEVEN BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NELLA FERNANDA HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?