GROSS v. DUNCAN et al
Plaintiff: AVERY GROSS
Defendant: SCOTT DUNCAN and AMY C SHEA
Case Number: 3:2020cv05369
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order. (initial fee not received) (sdw)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The clerk of court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $3.67. Plaintiff must pay the initial partial filing fee within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this order. The clerk of court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections. (Initial Fee due by 6/1/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 04/30/2020. (order w/ letter to DOC) (sdw)
April 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AVERY GROSS. (sdw)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must either (1) pay the filing fee of $400.00, or (2) file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (IFP motion/Filing Fee due by 5/11/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 04/09/2020. (form to Pla) (sdw)
April 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (sdw)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se litigant AVERY GROSS. (sdw)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT DUNCAN, AMY C SHEA filed by AVERY GROSS. (no service copies)(no filing fee/IFP motion) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROSS v. DUNCAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY C SHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVERY GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?