DEKOM v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, VERIZON, PRA RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT LLC, STATE FARM and LEIGH D HART
Appellant: MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR
Case Number: 3:2020cv05399
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Designation of Record by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (sdw)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM JACK MILLER, JR on behalf of LEIGH D HART (MILLER, WILLIAM)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Appellant has fourteen (14) days to file a corrected designation of record on both the docket of this Court and the Bankruptcy Court, clearly identifying the docket entries by number of items designated as the record for appeal. Appellees have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file a designation of additional items to be included. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this Order to the Bankruptcy Court. (Appellant's corrected designation due by 6/10/2020. Appellees designation of additional items due by 6/24/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/27/2020. (sdw)
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet (Supplemental). (jcw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR re #5 Notice. (jcw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE COURT, THE CLERK OR WHOM IT CONCERNS re SCHEDULING ORDER by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR (jcw)
April 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet (Supplemental). (jcw)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD ITEMS AND APPEAL QUESTIONS by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR. (Original mailed to Bankruptcy Court on 4/29/2020.) (jcw) o Modified on 4/29/2020 (jcw).
April 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group, Corporate Parent kkr wand investors, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub 1, LLC, Other Affiliate NATIONSTAR SUB2 LLC for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.. (CANTOR, ILEEN)
April 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ILEEN JILL CANTOR on behalf of NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC (CANTOR, ILEEN)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet (Supplemental) by MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of the Public BK Docket #2 bkr 297 Finding of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #3 bkr 299 Order Denying Debtor's Ntc, #4 bkr 300 Order Grantng Amd Mtn for Relief From Automatic Stay, #5 bkr 302 Order Denying Confirmation, #6 bkr 308 Order Overruling Dbr's Amd Obj, #7 Ntc of Appeal) (lmi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEKOM v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH W ECKHART
Represented By: ILEEN JILL CANTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VERIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PRA RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STATE FARM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEIGH D HART
Represented By: LEIGH DUNCAN HART
Represented By: WILLIAM JACK MILLER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARTIN JAMES DEKOM, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?