STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY v. CROOKE
Plaintiff: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER CROOKE
Case Number: 3:2020cv05407
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Vacate All Deadlines by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY (MALESKI, RICHARD)
June 18, 2020 Set Deadlines re #9 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Vacate All Deadlines. Stipulation of Dismissal Deadline - by 8/3/2020. (sdw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Timofey Popov on June 2, 2020, filed by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY. (MALESKI, RICHARD)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER re #6 Joint Report. All discovery must be completed by 9/30/2020. The pretrial conference will be scheduled by the Court after ruling on any pending dispositive motions and the trial date will be determined at the pretrial conference. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 05/13/2020. (sdw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MALESKI, RICHARD)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ALEXANDER ANDRADE on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CROOKE (ANDRADE, ROBERT)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Global Holdings, AG, Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc. for STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY.. (MALESKI, RICHARD)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/5/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/4/2020. Discovery due by 8/19/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 04/21/2020. (sdw) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/24/2020) (sdw).
April 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BEALL, CHARLES)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHRISTOPHER CROOKE from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, ESCAMBIA COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 2020 CA 000391. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5103859.), filed by CHRISTOPHER CROOKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit 2 - CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Exhibit 3 - SUMMONS, #4 Exhibit 4 - PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, #5 Exhibit 5 - FILING FEE RECEIPT, #6 Exhibit 6 - SUMMONS - ISSUED, #7 Exhibit 7 - RETURN OF SERVICE, #8 Exhibit 8 - ANSWER, #9 Exhibit 9 - DEF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) (BEALL, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY v. CROOKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER CROOKE
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT ALEXANDER ANDRADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD JOSEPH MALESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?