ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC v. BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC
Plaintiff: ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (U.S.), INC. and ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC
Defendant: BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC d/b/a BAY MEDICAL CENTER SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM and BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM
Case Number: 3:2020cv05479
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF FACTS Certificate of Interested Person and Corporate Disclosure Statement Re: #9 Answer to Complaint filed by BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC. (MOSES, ROBERT)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC. (MOSES, ROBERT)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC. (MOSES, ROBERT)
June 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 First MOTION to Extend TimeTO SUBMIT A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATORY COMPLAINT. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Extend TimeTO SUBMIT A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATORY COMPLAINT by BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (MOSES, ROBERT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC identifying Corporate Parent Allied World Insurance Company, a New Hampshire corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd., a Bermuda corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., a Bermuda corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings I, Ltd., a Bermuda corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd., a Bermuda corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd. is owned 67.8% by 1102952 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company, a British Columbia company, 20.4% by OCM Goldfish Inc., a Canadian company and an aggregate of 11.8% by other minority investors, Corporate Parent OCM Goldfish Inc. is wholly owned by OMERS Administration Corporation, a Canadian company, Corporate Parent 1102952 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company is wholly owned by Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, a Canadian corporation, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited is a publicly traded company, with 43% of its shares beneficially owned and controlled by Mr. Prem Watsa, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in New York, New York for ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC.. (GIDUS, GREGORY)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Delcaratory Judgment served on Bay County Health System, LLC d/b/a Bay Medical Center Sacred Heart Health System c/o Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent on May 27, 2020, filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC. (GIDUS, GREGORY)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC. (sdw)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons to be Issued on Bay County Health System, LLC d/b/a Bay Medical Center Sacred Heart Health system by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC re #1 Complaint, (GIDUS, GREGORY)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (sdw)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC d/b/a BAY MEDICAL CENTER SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5255033.), filed by ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (U.S.), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (GIDUS, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC v. BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (U.S.), INC.
Represented By: GREGORY ANDREW GIDUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY (US) INC
Represented By: GREGORY ANDREW GIDUS
Represented By: HEIDI HUDSON RASCHKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC d/b/a BAY MEDICAL CENTER SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY COUNTY HEALTH SYSTEM LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: ROBERT D MOSES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?