MONTGOMERY v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES MONTGOMERY
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv05508
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00189. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/1/2020.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8093835) filed by Charles Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Charles Montgomery(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTGOMERY v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES MONTGOMERY
Represented By: NATHAN LEE NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: SCOTT CHRISTOPHER SEILER
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT CHRISTOPHER SEILER
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?