JONES v. SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL JONES
Defendant: CMH HOMES, INC. doing business as CLAYTON HOMES OF CRESTVIEW and SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05629
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the First Judicial Circuit in and for Okaloosa County. The Clerk shall terminate all other pending motions and close the file in this Court. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 09/02/2020. (sdw)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.. (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH) Modified on 8/31/2020 to edit title of document (sdw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by CMH HOMES, INC.. (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH) Modified on 8/31/2020 to edit title of document (sdw).
August 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by CMH HOMES, INC., SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Credit Statement) (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH)
August 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Remand . (sdw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 26 Disclosures by CRYSTAL JONES. (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CRYSTAL JONES identifying Corporate Parent E. Holland Howanitz, Other Affiliate American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Other Affiliate Clayton Homes Of Crestview, Other Affiliate Southern Energy Homes, Inc, Other Affiliate PANHANDLE ASSOCIATES, INC, Other Affiliate Carter Mobile Home Movers, LLC, Other Affiliate Jeremy Kespohl, Other Affiliate Morgan & Morgan, Other Affiliate Wicker Smith OHara, McCoy & Ford, P.A for CRYSTAL JONES.. (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
August 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 Response to Motion. (sdw)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by CRYSTAL JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The #9 motion to stay is DENIED without prejudice to filing an amended motion in compliance with the local rules. If an amended motion is filed and is opposed by Defendants, a response shall be filed no later than 7 days after the amended motion is filed. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 07/31/2020. (sdw)
July 30, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #9 Motion to Stay Case. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/13/2020). (alb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by CRYSTAL JONES. (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
July 30, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #8 Motion to Remand. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/13/2020). (alb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by CRYSTAL JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY ALAN KESPOHL on behalf of CRYSTAL JONES (KESPOHL, JEREMY)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CMH HOMES, INC. identifying Other Affiliate BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC, Other Affiliate CMH Capital, Inc. for CMH HOMES, INC... (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC. identifying Other Affiliate BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC, Other Affiliate CMH Manufacturing, Inc for SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC... (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH)
July 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (sdw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CMH HOMES, INC., SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Binding Dispute Resolution Agreement) (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/24/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2020. Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 07/10/2020. (sdw)
July 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT)(mailed via USPS to Pla's counsel) (sdw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMH HOMES, INC., SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC. from Circuit Court Okaloosa County, case number 2020 CA 001273 F. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5462292.), filed by CMH HOMES, INC., SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH HOMES, INC. doing business as CLAYTON HOMES OF CRESTVIEW
Represented By: ELIZABETH HOLLAND HOWANITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN ENERGY HOMES, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH HOLLAND HOWANITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL JONES
Represented By: JEREMY ALAN KESPOHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?