STONE et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TONYA DOWNEN, RANDLE NEISS, BRYAN WASHINGTON, CHARLIE WILLEFORD, HELEN HAGOS, STEPHANIE ANNE STONE, KRISTINE NIEMCZUK, LACHERYL O'NEAL and SHEFFRA PETERSON
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, MCKESSON CORPORATION and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05634
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Compliance by RANDLE NEISS (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RANDLE NEISS. Counsel is directed to promptly provide the plaintiffs with a copy of this Order and to file a written notice of compliance with the Court, together with an address for the plaintiffs where all future filings and correspondence involving their cases should be directed. Thereafter, Behram V. Parekh, Esq. and the law firm of Kirtland & Packard LLP are relieved of any further obligation for representation of the plaintiffs in those matters. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/2/2020. (djb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RANDLE NEISS. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
September 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution (Plaintiff, Randie Neiss) (djb)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05118. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 20 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company regarding Second Notice of Removal. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 ***Case Reopened. Per order at docket# 18 . (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2584; Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2588; Evans v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2614; Adeniran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2620; Booth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5114; and Stone v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5118. The Court further DIRECTS Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why its "second notices of removal" filed in each case are procedurally proper and timely under 18 U.S.C. 1446. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S ECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case no. is 3:18-cv-02080. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. The parties are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-0254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/5/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #11 Stipulation TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/30/2018) Modified on 8/31/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/30/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/29/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Ground Of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568981. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12612834). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/21/2018) Modified on 8/22/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONE et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA DOWNEN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDLE NEISS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN WASHINGTON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE WILLEFORD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN HAGOS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE ANNE STONE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE NIEMCZUK
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LACHERYL O'NEAL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEFFRA PETERSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?