IN THE MATTER OF COASTAL PARASAIL INC
Petitioner: COASTAL PARASAIL, INC.
Counter Claimant: JANE KAZEMIAN and JOE KAZEMIAN
Counter Defendant: COASTAL PARASAIL INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05640
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by COASTAL PARASAIL INC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by COASTAL PARASAIL INC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
September 2, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 Initial Scheduling Order - Corporate Disclosure Statement has not been filed by COASTAL PARASAIL INC. (jcw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/1/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 08/18/2020. (alb)
August 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #9 Notice of Publication. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION by COASTAL PARASAIL INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Publication) (KELLY, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against COASTAL PARASAIL INC by JANE KAZEMIAN, JOE KAZEMIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (FOSTER, MATTHEW)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MONITION re #6 Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Monition, and Injunction.(Copy placed in USMS box). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 7/14/2020. (alb)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, MOTION, AND INJUNCTION. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 7/14/2020. (alb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING SURETY BOND FOR THE VALUE OF THE MOTOR VESSEL by COASTAL PARASAIL, INC. (Attachments: #1 LIMITATION OF LIABILITY SURETY BOND) (KELLY, MICHAEL)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FOR STIPULATION OF VALUE, MONITION AND INJUNCTION by COASTAL PARASAIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE, #2 Exhibit AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD J. SCHIEHL, BSEET, NAMS-CMS) (KELLY, MICHAEL)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION AND/OR FOR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY by COASTAL PARASAIL, INC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION AND/OR FOR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against JANE KAZEMIAN, JOE KAZEMIAN (Filing fee $400.), filed by COASTAL PARASAIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KELLY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF COASTAL PARASAIL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JANE KAZEMIAN
Represented By: MATTHEW K FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JOE KAZEMIAN
Represented By: MATTHEW K FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COASTAL PARASAIL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: COASTAL PARASAIL INC
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Represented By: MANUEL FERNANDO ALVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?