GROVE v. NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC et al
Plaintiff: ASHLEY GROVE
Defendant: NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC and JASON MICHAEL RING
Case Number: 3:2020cv05656
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: COUNTS IV, VI, VII, AND VIII OF COMPLAINT, #12 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: COUNTS IV, VI, VII, AND VIII OF COMPLAINT filed by ASHLEY GROVE. (VERSTANDIG, MAURICE)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ASHLEY GROVE (VERSTANDIG, MAURICE)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: COUNTS IV, VI, VII, AND VIII OF COMPLAINT by NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/8/2020). (mb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: COUNTS IV, VI, VII, AND VIII OF COMPLAINT by NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. (HAYDEN, BRIAN)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA KATHLEEN MADDALENA on behalf of JASON MICHAEL RING (MADDALENA, JULIA)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN DAVID SHARKEY on behalf of NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint, as requested (2 weeks, to August 26, 2020). (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/26/2020).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/5/2020. (mb)
August 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (mb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. (HAYDEN, BRIAN)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASHLEY GROVE. JASON MICHAEL RING served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (VERSTANDIG, MAURICE)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASHLEY GROVE. NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (VERSTANDIG, MAURICE)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC, (Attachments: #1 Summons - JASON RING) (mb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Trial by Jury against Niceville Refrigeration & Air Conditioning, Inc., Jason Michael Ring ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5505611.), filed by Ashley Grove. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Form of Summons for Issuance to Niceville Refrigeration & Air Conditioning, Inc., #3 Proposed Form of Summons for Issuance to Jason Michael Ring) (VERSTANDIG, MAURICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROVE v. NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY GROVE
Represented By: MAURICE BELMONT VERSTANDIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICEVILLE REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID SHARKEY
Represented By: BRIAN LEE HAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON MICHAEL RING
Represented By: JULIA KATHLEEN MADDALENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?