BANKS v. INCH
Petitioner: ANTOINE TYSHAWN BANKS
Respondent: MARK S INCH and JAMES GILL
Case Number: 3:2020cv05657
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #3 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (90 Day No Activity Deadline set for 11/16/2020.) (sdw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, close this case file, and send Petitioner the petition form for habeas cases filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 08/18/2020. (sdw)
August 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (no objections filed) (sdw)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This case be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The clerk of the court close this case file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/18/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/21/2020. (jcw)
July 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by ANTOINE TYSHAWN BANKS. (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKS v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAMES GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTOINE TYSHAWN BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?