GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE v. IVORY LADY LLC
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE
Defendant: Ivory Lady LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05680
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE. IVORY LADY LLC waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (GOLDMAN, STEVEN)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (alb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE LOUISE GOLDMAN on behalf of GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE (GOLDMAN, JACQUELINE)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment against Ivory Lady LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5533338.), filed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (GOLDMAN, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE v. IVORY LADY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE
Represented By: STEVEN ERIC GOLDMAN
Represented By: JACQUELINE LOUISE GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivory Lady LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?